NJ S1249 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 28 2010 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-21 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires municipalities eligible for Special Municipal Aid to submit budgets for special improvement districts and municipal public benefit corporation for DCA review, requires State Comptroller conduct audits of municipalities receiving aid.
Title
Requires municipalities eligible for Special Municipal Aid to submit budgets for special improvement districts and municipal public benefit corporation for DCA review, requires State Comptroller conduct audits of municipalities receiving aid.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-28 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-21 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-28 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee | |
2010-06-28 | Passed by the Senate (40-0) | |
2010-05-10 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-08 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |