NJ S1287 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3884
Note: Carry Over of previous A5419
Note: Carry Over of previous A5419
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 11:00 am in Committee Room 4, 1st Floor, State House Annex, Trenton, NJ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: May 6 @ 11:00 am in Committee Room 4, 1st Floor, State House Annex, Trenton, NJ
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Removes obstacles to teacher certification for certain teachers.
Title
Removes obstacles to teacher certification for certain teachers.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3884 (Carry Over) 2023-05-22 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5419 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1669 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5419 (Carry Over) 2023-06-01 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A1669 (Same As) 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1287 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1500/1287_I1.HTM |