NJ S1302 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2036
Note: Carry Over of previous A1880
Note: Carry Over of previous A1880
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires newly-elected municipal, county, and State political party committee members to assume office upon certification for election and hold first meeting on second Saturday, second Monday, and second Tuesday following primary election, respectively.
Title
Requires newly-elected municipal, county, and State political party committee members to assume office upon certification for election and hold first meeting on second Saturday, second Monday, and second Tuesday following primary election, respectively.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2036 (Carry Over) 2018-10-22 - Transferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2917 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1880 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2917 (Same As) 2020-02-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A1880 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1302 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S1500/1302_I1.HTM |