NJ S1403 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on August 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, c.251.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Permits service credit transferred from another State-administered retirement system to apply toward creditable service requirement for retirement in SPRS.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits service credit transferred from another State-administered retirement system to apply toward creditable service requirement for retirement in SPRS.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A3976 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-08-23SenateApproved P.L.2019, c.251.
2019-06-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0)
2019-06-20SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2019-06-20AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (76-0-0)
2019-06-20AssemblySubstituted for A3976 (3R)
2019-05-23AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-03-11AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-25AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
2019-02-21SenatePassed by the Senate (35-0)
2019-02-07SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-01-31SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2019-01-31SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-01SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3976 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by S1403 (5R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback