NJ S1406 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-3)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-25-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-25-1)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "New Jersey Property Assessment Clean Energy (NJ PACE) Municipal Financing Program."
Title
Establishes "New Jersey Property Assessment Clean Energy (NJ PACE) Municipal Financing Program."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 45 N: 25 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-06-29 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (45-25-1) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for A2502 (ACS) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-21 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2011-06-29 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Telecommunications and Utilities Committee | |
2011-06-29 | Passed by the Senate (26-8) | |
2011-06-27 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-03 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2010-06-03 | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2502 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by S1406 (SCS)