NJ S1420 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 19-5)
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 11 2016 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-19 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires paint producers to implement or participate in paint stewardship program.*
Title
Requires paint producers to implement or participate in paint stewardship program.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A1603 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-11 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 46 N: 27 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-05-18 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-09 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-01-12 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-19 | Assembly | Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (46-27-0) |
2016-01-11 | Assembly | Substituted for A1603 (ACS) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-01 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-05-18 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (26-7) |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-01-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1603 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Substituted by S1420 (SCS)