NJ S143 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1536
Note: Carry Foward to future S322
Note: Carry Over of previous S3096
Note: Carry Over of previous S2318
Note: Carry Foward to future S322
Note: Carry Over of previous S3096
Note: Carry Over of previous S2318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
"Improved Suicide Prevention, Response, and Treatment Act."
Title
"Improved Suicide Prevention, Response, and Treatment Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S143 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S143 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3096 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3750 (Same As) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2318 (Carry Over) 2020-04-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S143 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3096 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3750 (Same As) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
S2318 (Carry Over) 2020-04-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S143 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S0500/143_I1.HTM |