NJ S1439 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3919
Note: Carry Over of previous A5875
Note: Carry Over of previous A5875
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires health benefits coverage for additional prosthetic appliance under certain circumstances.
Title
Requires health benefits coverage for additional prosthetic appliance under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3919 (Carry Over) 2024-01-08 - Passed by the Senate (35-0)
A5875 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A3856 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A5875 (Carry Over) 2023-12-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
A3856 (Same As) 2024-02-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S1439 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S1500/1439_I1.HTM |