NJ S144 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3311
Note: Carry Over of previous A6023
Note: Carry Over of previous A6023
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Approved P.L.2022, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-07-29 - Approved P.L.2022, c.73.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "COVID-19 Frontline and Healthcare Worker Memorial Commission."
Title
Establishes "COVID-19 Frontline and Healthcare Worker Memorial Commission."
Sponsors
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Sen. James Beach [D] | Rep. Joseph Egan [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur in Assembly Amendments (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2159 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A2159 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-29 | Senate | Approved P.L.2022, c.73. |
2022-05-26 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2022-03-24 | Assembly | Substituted for A2159 (1R) |
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-03-07 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Diegnan) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3311 (Carry Over) 2021-11-08 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A6023 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2159 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Substituted by S144 (2R)
A6023 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2159 (Same As) 2022-03-24 - Substituted by S144 (2R)