NJ S1474 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1039
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2007, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on February 6 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-02-06 - Approved P.L.2007, c.6.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires teacher preparation program for instructional certificate to include certain amount of instruction or clinical experience in special education and for students with disabilities endorsement to include credit hours in autism spectrum disorder.
Title
Requires teacher preparation program for instructional certificate to include certain amount of instruction or clinical experience in special education and for students with disabilities endorsement to include credit hours in autism spectrum disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A2786 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-11-14 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-10-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-06 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2007, c.6. |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (77-0-0) |
2016-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A2786 (1R) |
2016-11-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-10-20 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2016-10-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2016-10-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (26-0) (Beach) |
2016-09-12 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1039 (Carry Over) 2015-11-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2786 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S1474 (1R)
A2786 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by S1474 (1R)