NJ S1479 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.202.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Upgrades crime of soliciting or recruiting for criminal street gang while on school property.
Title
Upgrades crime of soliciting or recruiting for criminal street gang while on school property.
Sponsors
Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Jay Webber [R] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2114 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A2114 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.202. |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted for A2114 |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2114 (Same As) 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S1479