NJ S1557 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S215
Note: Carry Over of previous S881
Note: Carry Over of previous S881
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-19 - Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides full forfeiture of pension of elected or appointed official convicted of any crime touching office.
Title
Provides full forfeiture of pension of elected or appointed official convicted of any crime touching office.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-06 - Senate - Senate Floor: Table Motion (Y: 20 N: 13 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-19 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg) |
2017-06-19 | Senate | Motion Relieve From Committee (Beck) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-15) (Weinberg) |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Motion Relieve From Committee (Beck) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Motion To Table (20-13) (Weinberg) |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Motion Order of the Day (Beck) |
2016-02-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1557 (Carry Over) 2017-06-19 - Motion To Table (20-16) (Weinberg)
S881 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4377 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S881 (Carry Over) 2014-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4377 (Same As) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee