NJ S1593 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1965
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on August 10 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-08-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Police Officer, Firefighter, Public School Teacher, Corrections Officer, and Sanitation Worker Home-buyer Assistance Act."; appropriates $5 million.*
Title
Establishes "Police Officer, Firefighter, Public School Teacher, Corrections Officer, and Sanitation Worker Home-buyer Assistance Act."; appropriates $5 million.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A213 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A213 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 24 N: 13 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A213 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-25 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A213 Acaa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-06-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 14 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-12-08 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-05-19 - Senate - Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 3 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-08-10 | Assembly | Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (24-13) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-28-0) |
2015-06-25 | Assembly | Substituted for A213 (2R) |
2015-06-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2015-03-16 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-14) |
2014-12-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2014-05-19 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2014-02-27 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1593 (Carry Over) 2015-08-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
A213 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S1593 (1R)
A213 (Same As) 2015-06-25 - Substituted by S1593 (1R)