NJ S1614 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A2954

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-07 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Increases amount annually credited to Shore Protection Fund to $50 million.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Increases amount annually credited to Shore Protection Fund to $50 million.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-07 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-07SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A826 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
A2954 (Carry Over) 2016-09-08 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback