NJ S1738 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A955
Note: Carry Foward to future A2151
Note: Carry Over of previous S1596
Note: Carry Over of previous A509
Note: Carry Foward to future A2151
Note: Carry Over of previous S1596
Note: Carry Over of previous A509
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
Pending: Senate Economic Growth Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows commercial farmer to recover reasonable costs and attorney fees of defending against unreasonable complaints under "Right to Farm Act."
Title
Allows commercial farmer to recover reasonable costs and attorney fees of defending against unreasonable complaints under "Right to Farm Act."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1738 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
S1738 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A591 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1596 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A509 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
S1738 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A591 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture Committee
S1596 (Carry Over) 2018-02-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
A509 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S1738 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2000/1738_I1.HTM |