NJ S1828 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Limits homeowners' association regulation of structures reasonably necessary or convenient for the accommodation or therapy of physically disabled persons.
Title
Limits homeowners' association regulation of structures reasonably necessary or convenient for the accommodation or therapy of physically disabled persons.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2013-11-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-03 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4557 (Same As) 2013-12-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Local Government Committee