NJ S1907 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.205.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes criminal penalties for killing, injuring or interfering with a service animal or guide dog; designated as "Dusty's Law." *
Title
Establishes criminal penalties for killing, injuring or interfering with a service animal or guide dog; designated as "Dusty's Law." *
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4105 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4105 Acs (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-12-20 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.205. |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2014-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (79-0-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A4105 (ACS) |
2013-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-08 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
2012-12-20 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-05-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2728 (Same As) 2012-03-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A4105 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S1907 (1R)
A4105 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S1907 (1R)