NJ S2033 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S3298
Note: Carry Over of previous A4799
Note: Carry Over of previous A4799
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits youth-serving patriotic societies to speak with public school students during regular school hours.
Title
Permits youth-serving patriotic societies to speak with public school students during regular school hours.
Sponsors
Sen. Vin Gopal [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3298 (Carry Over) 2022-11-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4799 (Carry Over) 2022-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3663 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A4799 (Carry Over) 2022-10-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A3663 (Same As) 2024-02-12 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2033 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2033_I1.HTM |