NJ S2078 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S674
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on January 8 2018 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires training for pesticide applicators and operators concerning pollinating bees.
Title
Requires training for pesticide applicators and operators concerning pollinating bees.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A3400 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-01-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-08 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0) |
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Substituted for A3400 |
2017-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-09-15 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2016-09-15 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (36-0) |
2016-09-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-25 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2078 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
A3400 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2078
A3400 (Same As) 2018-01-08 - Substituted by S2078