NJ S2167 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 25 2012 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for permanent debarment from government contracting of any person who is convicted of certain crimes involving government contracts.
Title
Provides for permanent debarment from government contracting of any person who is convicted of certain crimes involving government contracts.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-25 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-11-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
2012-10-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3425 (Same As) 2013-01-17 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading