NJ S2167 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 21 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-01-24 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Dedicates $500,000 annually in revenues from vessel registration and renewal fees to NJ Greenwood Lake Fund.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Dedicates $500,000 annually in revenues from vessel registration and renewal fees to NJ Greenwood Lake Fund.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-01-24 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-21 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-21SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-21SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-03-05SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3804 (Same As) 2019-01-24 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback