NJ S2197 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 9 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits compressed natural gas as fuel source to power school buses.
Title
Permits compressed natural gas as fuel source to power school buses.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-09 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-09-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3418 (Same As) 2013-03-14 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading