NJ S2208 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S1664
Note: Carry Over of previous A2835
Note: Carry Over of previous A2835
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to create and maintain database of Educational Opportunity Fund student admissions.
Title
Requires Secretary of Higher Education to create and maintain database of Educational Opportunity Fund student admissions.
Sponsors
Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-04 - Senate - Senate Higher Eduction Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1664 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Higher Education Committee
A2835 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1969 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A2835 (Carry Over) 2022-02-28 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee
A1969 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Higher Education Committee