NJ S2246 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1612
Note: Carry Foward to future S1276
Note: Carry Foward to future S418
Note: Carry Over of previous S1166
Note: Carry Over of previous A3051
Note: Carry Foward to future S1276
Note: Carry Foward to future S418
Note: Carry Over of previous S1166
Note: Carry Over of previous A3051
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes new offenses concerning the unlawful possession and use of credit card scanners.
Title
Establishes new offenses concerning the unlawful possession and use of credit card scanners.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3320 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1166 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3051 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S2246 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3320 (Same As) 2020-02-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
S1166 (Carry Over) 2018-01-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A3051 (Carry Over) 2018-02-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2246 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S2500/2246_I1.HTM |