NJ S2254 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3360 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on October 15 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A3360 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Veterans Haven North Council; renames current Veterans Haven Council to Veterans Haven South Council.
Title
Creates Veterans Haven North Council; renames current Veterans Haven Council to Veterans Haven South Council.
Sponsors
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Diane Allen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A3360 (1R) |
2013-12-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Recommitted to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2012-12-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-10-15 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3360 (Same As) 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.260.
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2254 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2254_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2254_R1.HTM |