NJ S2273 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1877
Note: Carry Foward to future A4236
Note: Carry Over of previous A2028
Note: Carry Over of previous S3391
Note: Carry Over of previous S486
Note: Carry Over of previous A3594
Note: Carry Foward to future A4236
Note: Carry Over of previous A2028
Note: Carry Over of previous S3391
Note: Carry Over of previous S486
Note: Carry Over of previous A3594
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires voter who wishes to vote by mail to complete application for mail-in ballot each calendar year; repeals automatic vote-by-mail designation.
Title
Requires voter who wishes to vote by mail to complete application for mail-in ballot each calendar year; repeals automatic vote-by-mail designation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-10 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2273 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S2273 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2028 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3391 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4638 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S486 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3594 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S855 (1R)
S2273 (Carry Over) 2022-03-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A2028 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S3391 (Carry Over) 2021-02-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A4638 (Same As) 2022-09-22 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S486 (Carry Over) 2020-06-08 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
A3594 (Carry Over) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S855 (1R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/S2273 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/S2500/2273_I1.HTM |