NJ S2346 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2429
Note: Carry Over of previous A3540
Note: Carry Over of previous A3540
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Pending: Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Code Red alert pilot program to shelter at-risk individuals during hot weather.
Title
Creates Code Red alert pilot program to shelter at-risk individuals during hot weather.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2429 (Carry Over) 2023-11-30 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A3540 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2258 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A3540 (Carry Over) 2023-12-18 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
A2258 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2346 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2346_I1.HTM |