NJ S2396 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3774
Note: Carry Over of previous S2292
Note: Carry Over of previous S2292
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 29 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-29 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Excludes certain unemployment compensation recipients from paying civil service open competitive examination application and appeal fees.
Title
Excludes certain unemployment compensation recipients from paying civil service open competitive examination application and appeal fees.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2866 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A3774 (Carry Over) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2292 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A3774 (Carry Over) 2022-05-02 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S2292 (Carry Over) 2022-03-21 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2396 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S2500/2396_I1.HTM |