NJ S2418 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3808 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 5 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A3808 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for prompt payment of public contracts for purchase of goods and services.
Title
Provides for prompt payment of public contracts for purchase of goods and services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-07 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-25 | Senate | Substituted by A3808 (1R) |
2018-06-07 | Senate | Senate Amendment (30-0) (Singleton) |
2018-05-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-04-05 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3808 (Same As) 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.127.