NJ S2499 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3323/3324 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-09 - Substituted by A3323/3324 (AS)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires each State agency to review permits issued by the agency and make necessary changes to expedite and facilitate permitting.
Title
Requires each State agency to review permits issued by the agency and make necessary changes to expedite and facilitate permitting.
Sponsors
Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Dawn Addiego [D] | Sen. Steven Oroho [R] | Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
Sen. Robert Gordon [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-09 | Senate | Substituted by A3323/3324 (AS) |
2013-01-28 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-01-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3323 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2499 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S2500/2499_I1.HTM |