NJ S2510 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on April 16 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-07-01 - Substituted by A3754
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempts persons providing hair braiding services from licensure requirement, requires registration of hair braiding establishments.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Exempts persons providing hair braiding services from licensure requirement, requires registration of hair braiding establishments.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-18 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-10 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-07-01SenateSubstituted by A3754
2018-06-18SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-05-10SenateReferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2018-05-10SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-04-16SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A3754 (Same As) 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.126.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback