NJ S2514 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1301
Note: Carry Over of previous A5352
Note: Carry Over of previous S2693
Note: Carry Over of previous A5352
Note: Carry Over of previous S2693
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns prevailing wage payments in residential construction projects.
Title
Concerns prevailing wage payments in residential construction projects.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-04 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2514 (Carry Over) 2020-06-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1290 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5352 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2693 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
A1290 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
A5352 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee
S2693 (Carry Over) 2018-06-11 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/S2514 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/S3000/2514_I1.HTM |