NJ S2518 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on August 12 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-12 - Approved P.L.2020, c.63.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Delays physical examination requirement for certain student-athletes who participate in school-sponsored athletic activities during fall athletic season of 2020-2021 school year.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Delays physical examination requirement for certain student-athletes who participate in school-sponsored athletic activities during fall athletic season of 2020-2021 school year.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A4295 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-07-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-15 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-06-11 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-08-12SenateApproved P.L.2020, c.63.
2020-07-30SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (40-0)
2020-07-30SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2020-07-30AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-1-1)
2020-07-30AssemblySubstituted for A4295 (1R)
2020-07-09AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee
2020-06-15SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2020-06-11SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2020-06-11SenateTransferred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
2020-06-04SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4295 (Same As) 2020-07-30 - Substituted by S2518 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback