NJ S2531 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S2912
Note: Carry Over of previous A2131
Note: Carry Over of previous A2131
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-18 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides police officers may be present at senior residential center or school being used as polling place under certain circumstances; requires school to establish election day security plan.
Title
Provides police officers may be present at senior residential center or school being used as polling place under certain circumstances; requires school to establish election day security plan.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-18 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2912 (Carry Over) 2022-11-03 - Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
A2131 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S2912 (2R)
A3862 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
A2131 (Carry Over) 2022-10-27 - Substituted by S2912 (2R)
A3862 (Same As) 2024-02-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee