NJ S2565 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A1477
Note: Carry Foward to future S1536
Note: Carry Foward to future S946
Note: Carry Over of previous S2452
Note: Carry Over of previous A4276
Note: Carry Foward to future S1536
Note: Carry Foward to future S946
Note: Carry Over of previous S2452
Note: Carry Over of previous A4276
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 11 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Increases allowance paid to war veterans with certain service-connected disabilities.
Title
Increases allowance paid to war veterans with certain service-connected disabilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. Michael Testa [R] | Sen. Vin Gopal [D] | Sen. Anthony M. Bucco [R] |
Sen. James Holzapfel [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-11-15 - Senate - Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2020-06-11 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2565 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2565 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2565 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2559 (Same As) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2452 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4276 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee
S2565 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2565 (Carry Over) 2021-11-15 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A2559 (Same As) 2022-01-04 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S2452 (Carry Over) 2019-01-24 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A4276 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee