NJ S2580 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.212.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Passed on January 17 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-17 - Approved P.L.2013, c.212.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates State Highway Route 53 as "Alex DeCroce Memorial Highway."
Title
Designates State Highway Route 53 as "Alex DeCroce Memorial Highway."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3789 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-01-06 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A3789 Aca (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-09-12 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-17 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.212. |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Substituted for A3789 (1R) |
2013-11-18 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-09-12 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3789 (Same As) 2014-01-06 - Substituted by S2580 (1R)