NJ S2653 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 9 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-13 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee
Pending: Assembly State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Extends deadline for filing nominating petitions each year new legislative districts are established by Apportionment Commission.
Title
Extends deadline for filing nominating petitions each year new legislative districts are established by Apportionment Commission.
Sponsors
Sen. Ronald Rice [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-06-09 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 33 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-13 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee | |
2011-06-09 | Passed by the Senate (33-1) | |
2011-03-10 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-25 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3910 (Same As) 2011-03-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee