NJ S2669 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2491
Note: Carry Over of previous S2088
Note: Carry Over of previous S2088
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes manufacturing machine and metal trade apprenticeship tax credit program.
Title
Establishes manufacturing machine and metal trade apprenticeship tax credit program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A512 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce, Economic Development and Agriculture Committee
A2491 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2088 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
A2491 (Carry Over) 2022-02-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee
S2088 (Carry Over) 2022-03-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/S2669 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/S3000/2669_I1.HTM |