NJ S2709 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-4)
Status: Passed on May 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-10 - Approved P.L.2019, c.108.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Provides that certain persons who commit act of sexual penetration or sexual contact with students who are at least 18 but less than 22 years old are guilty of sexual assault or criminal sexual assault.**
Title
Provides that certain persons who commit act of sexual penetration or sexual contact with students who are at least 18 but less than 22 years old are guilty of sexual assault or criminal sexual assault.**
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A1909 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-31 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-11-26 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-10 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.108. |
2019-03-14 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2019-02-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2019-01-31 | Assembly | Substituted for A1909/4404 (ACS) |
2018-11-26 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-25 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
2018-06-25 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (39-0) |
2018-06-21 | Senate | Senate Amendment (33-0) (Ruiz) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4404 (Same As) 2018-11-26 - Combined with A1909 (ACS)
A1909 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2709 (2R)
A1909 (Same As) 2019-01-31 - Substituted by S2709 (2R)