NJ S2733 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2888 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 29 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by A2888 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Creates Office of Clean Energy in BPU.*
Title
Creates Office of Clean Energy in BPU.*
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Smith [D] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] | Sen. James Whelan [D] | Sen. Christopher Bateman [R] |
Sen. Jennifer Beck [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Senate | Substituted by A2888 (1R) |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-29 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2888 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/S2733 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/S3000/2733_I1.HTM |