NJ S2779 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.178.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on January 13 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-01-13 - Approved P.L.2013, c.178.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Allows practitioner with financial interest in health care service providing lithotripsy to refer patients to that health care service if certain conditions are met.
Title
Allows practitioner with financial interest in health care service providing lithotripsy to refer patients to that health care service if certain conditions are met.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Vitale [D] | Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] |
Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Amy Handlin [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4222 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Substitute For A4222 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2013, c.178. |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (79-0-0) |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Substituted for A4222 |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2013-06-03 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4222 (Same As) 2013-12-19 - Substituted by S2779