NJ S2819 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on July 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-21 - Approved P.L.2017, c.132.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Creates "Nourishing Young Minds Initiative Fund" in Dept. of Agriculture to help pay for child food and nutrition programs.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Creates "Nourishing Young Minds Initiative Fund" in Dept. of Agriculture to help pay for child food and nutrition programs.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4363 Aa (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-08 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-01-12 - Senate - Senate Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-21AssemblyApproved P.L.2017, c.132.
2017-06-08AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-0)
2017-06-08AssemblySubstituted for A4363 (1R)
2017-02-15AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2017-02-13SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2017-01-23SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2016-11-21SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4363 (Same As) 2017-06-08 - Substituted by S2819 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback