NJ S2820 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-01-11 - Substituted by A3927
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires drivers to slow down before passing slow moving vehicles; establishes Statewide educational campaign on rural roadway safety; updates agriculture-related motor vehicle laws to reflect current industry practices.
Title
Requires drivers to slow down before passing slow moving vehicles; establishes Statewide educational campaign on rural roadway safety; updates agriculture-related motor vehicle laws to reflect current industry practices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-01-07 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-12-10 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-01-11 | Senate | Substituted by A3927 |
2016-01-07 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2015-12-10 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3927 (Same As) 2016-01-19 - Approved P.L.2015, c.292.