NJ S2857 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 13 2014 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes new procedure to fill congressional vacancy be filled on general election day; requires Governor to make appointment from same party to temporarily fill Senate vacancy.*
Title
Establishes new procedure to fill congressional vacancy be filled on general election day; requires Governor to make appointment from same party to temporarily fill Senate vacancy.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-01-13 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 23 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Senate Substitute (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Senate Substitute (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-12-19 - Senate - Senate Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (23-16) |
2013-12-19 | Senate | Senate Substitution (22-0) (Turner) |
2013-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-06-13 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |