NJ S2909 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1968
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes private persons to display American flag on bridges and overpasses that travel over property of NJTA and SJTA; prohibits NJTA and SJTA from removing American flag under certain circumstances.
Title
Authorizes private persons to display American flag on bridges and overpasses that travel over property of NJTA and SJTA; prohibits NJTA and SJTA from removing American flag under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-10-29 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-08 - Senate - Senate Transportation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-11-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
2020-10-29 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2020-10-08 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-09-17 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2909 (Carry Over) 2020-11-05 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4667 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4667 (Same As) 2020-09-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee