NJ S2932 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Pending: Assembly Regulated Professions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns the sale of portable electronics insurance and licensing of limited lines insurance producers for that purpose.
Title
Concerns the sale of portable electronics insurance and licensing of limited lines insurance producers for that purpose.
Sponsors
Sen. Anthony R. Bucco [R] | Sen. Barbara Buono [D] | Sen. Gerald Cardinale [R] | Sen. Nicholas Sacco [D] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (38-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-06-09 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4302 (Same As) 2011-11-21 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee