NJ S2964 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on January 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-08 - Approved P.L.2017, c.256.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits residential substance use disorder treatment facilities and aftercare facilities from denying admission to individuals receiving medication assisted treatment for substance use disorder.
Title
Prohibits residential substance use disorder treatment facilities and aftercare facilities from denying admission to individuals receiving medication assisted treatment for substance use disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute For A4707 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-11-30 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-27 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2017, c.256. |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (71-0-0) |
2017-12-07 | Assembly | Substituted for A4707 |
2017-11-30 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-03-16 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (35-0) |
2017-02-27 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4707 (Same As) 2017-12-07 - Substituted by S2964