NJ S3010 | 2014-2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 8 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-12-17 - Substituted by A4518
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Allows certain businesses to qualify as mega projects under the "Grow New Jersey Assistance Act."
Title
Allows certain businesses to qualify as mega projects under the "Grow New Jersey Assistance Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-29 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-17 | Senate | Substituted by A4518 |
2015-06-29 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2015-06-08 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4518 (Same As) 2016-01-11 - Approved P.L.2015, c.217.