NJ S3046 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-29-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on December 15 2011 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-29-0)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires State to provide recipients of State tax refunds, unemployment insurance benefits and State employee compensation certain payment options.
Title
Requires State to provide recipients of State tax refunds, unemployment insurance benefits and State employee compensation certain payment options.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Nia Gill [D] | Rep. Gary Schaer [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 42 N: 29 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 26 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (42-29-0) | |
2011-12-15 | Substituted for A4323 | |
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (26-13) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-21 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-11-21 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-11-21 | Transferred to Senate Commerce Committee | |
2011-09-19 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4323 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Substituted by S3046