NJ S3061 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Pending: Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Imposes certain registration and reporting requirements to prevent illegal trade of tigers.
Title
Imposes certain registration and reporting requirements to prevent illegal trade of tigers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Senate (37-0) | |
2011-12-08 | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-01 | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee | |
2011-12-01 | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2011-09-22 | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4392 (Same As) 2011-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee